This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/09/2022 at 07:47:45 (UTC).

Blue Moon Cleaning Services Inc vs. Badger Packaging

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Blue Moon Cleaning Services Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Badger Packaging. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Giernoth, Sandra J and Russell, Theresa M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1102

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Giernoth, Sandra J

Russell, Theresa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blue Moon Cleaning Services Inc

150 W Progress Dr

West Bend, WI 53095

Defendant

Badger Packaging

West Bend, WI 53095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Acevedo, Michael

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial/scheduling conference; Court Official: Giernoth, Sandra J.; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1254 (262)335-4341; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter received from Atty M. Acevedo dated 01/31/2022 requesting change and adjournment of PSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Per letter from counsel and direction of Court, PSC set 2-1-22 at 10:00am, rescheduled to 4-5-22 at 10:00am; notice sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial/scheduling conference on April 5, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial/scheduling conference on February 1, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Michael Acevedo, for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: filed by Atty M. Acevedo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 210682, Payable Number: 162100, Receipt Number: 21R 023647, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $75.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on Badger Packaging on 11/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: Return Date: 12/06/21 at 9:00 a.m. ($950.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 022082

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Acevedo, Michael