This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 19:15:05 (UTC).

BCG Equities, LLC vs. DAWN DELABREAU

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 BCG Equities, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAWN DELABREAU. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0058

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BCG Equities, LLC

225 S. Executive Dr.

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant

DELABREAU, DAWN

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Garnishee

Homes for Independent Living of Wisconsin LLC

1746 Executive Dr

Oconomowoc, WI 53066

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stueckroth, Richard E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: to Homes for Independent Living of Wisconsin LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 006029, Payable Number: 352877, Receipt Number: 21R 009617, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 006029, Payable Number: 352877, Receipt Number: 21R 009617, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002848, Payable Number: 350443, Receipt Number: 21R 003815, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHEBOYGAN; Case number: 2021SC000058; Caption: BCG Equities, LLC vs. DAWN DELABREAU; Total Amount: $1121.28; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: DAWN DELABREAU; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1117 S 17TH ST, Sheboygan, WI 53081 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: BCG Equities, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 225 S. Executive Dr., Brookfield, WI 53005 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $954.78; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: 09:22 AM Money judgment for plaintiff by default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: From Court to all litigants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: $954.78

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000369, Payable Number: 348897, Receipt Number: 21R 000674, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: As to: Dawn Delabreau

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stueckroth, Richard E