This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 17:42:46 (UTC).

BCG Equities, LLC. vs. CHARLES B FOSTER IV

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 BCG Equities, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES B FOSTER IV. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Grill, Leo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0026

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Grill, Leo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BCG Equities, LLC.

225 S Executive Dr. Suite 201

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant

FOSTER, CHARLES B, IV

Fitchburg, WI 53593-9302

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackelly, Meghan Patricia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Transmittal fee paid; Amount: $15.0; Additional Text: 21R 002500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover Letter; change of venue fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of transmittal - Electronic; Additional Text: to Dane County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service; Additional Text: on Charles B. Foster IV; $63.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for FOSTER, CHARLES B, IV; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for CHARLES B FOSTER IV Current: 9303 Glencoe Drive, Fitchburg, WI 53593-9302 United States (Effective: 02-03-2021) Prior: 112 FOREST DR APT 805, Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to Change Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for change of venue; Court Official: Grill, Leo; Additional Text: Order for Change of Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for change of venue; Court Official: Grill, Leo; Additional Text: to Dane County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of venue - case to be refiled out of county; Court Official: Grill, Leo; Additional Text: to Dane County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: Money demand for $1,773.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000164, Payable Number: 236068, Receipt Number: 21R 000596, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mackelly, Meghan Patricia