This case was last updated from Manitowoc County Courts on 02/02/2022 at 08:59:32 (UTC).

Baycare Health Systems, LLC vs. Jeannine S. Leslie

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 Baycare Health Systems, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jeannine S Leslie. This case was filed in Manitowoc County Courts, Manitowoc County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Dewane, Robert and Koppa, Patricia A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0247

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Manitowoc, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Dewane, Robert

Koppa, Patricia A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baycare Health Systems, LLC

Po Box 28900

Green Bay, WI 54324

Defendant

Leslie, Jeannine S.

Manitowoc, WI 54221

Garnishee

Walmart Stores, Inc.

P.O. Box 82, Attn: Adp Garnishments

Bentonville, AR 72712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Foscato, John Anthony

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: filed against Jeannine S. Leslie, defendant and Walmart Stores, Inc., garnishee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 168071, Payable Number: 150329, Receipt Number: 21R 011927, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 168071, Payable Number: 150329, Receipt Number: 21R 011927, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: filed against Jeannine S. Leslie and garnishee, Walmart Stores, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 074712, Payable Number: 146902, Receipt Number: 21R 005340, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 074712, Payable Number: 146902, Receipt Number: 21R 005340, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 056114, Payable Number: 146398, Receipt Number: 21R 004111, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: MANITOWOC; Case number: 2021SC000247; Caption: Baycare Health Systems, LLC vs. Jeannine S. Leslie; Total Amount: $6716.65; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jeannine S. Leslie; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1211 S 17th St., PO Box 1651, Manitowoc, WI 54221 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Baycare Health Systems, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 28900, Green Bay, WI 54324 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $6220.15; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Garnishment costs; Amount: $112.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Garnishment costs; Amount: $112.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.; Additional Text: Attorney John Anthony Foscato appeared by letter for Plaintiff Baycare Health Systems, LLC. Defendant Jeannine S. Leslie not in court. Minutes. Court grants default judgment to Plaintiff(s) against the defendant(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Service by mail; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.; Additional Text: NEJ and OFIND mailed/electronically sent to parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 037092, Payable Number: 145715, Receipt Number: 21R 002363, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with DMDC attachment as to Jeannine Leslie, by Attorney Foscato

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: Attorney Foscato requesting judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: COVID-19 appearance information mailed to Defendant; electronically sent to Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foscato, John Anthony