This case was last updated from Manitowoc County Courts on 02/09/2022 at 00:43:13 (UTC).

Baycare Clinic LLP vs. Floyd Heth III

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Baycare Clinic LLP filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Floyd Heth III. This case was filed in Manitowoc County Courts, Manitowoc County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Dietz, Jerilyn M, Koppa, Patricia A and Zigmunt, Lynn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1066

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Manitowoc, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Dietz, Jerilyn M

Koppa, Patricia A

Zigmunt, Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baycare Clinic LLP

Po Box 28900

Green Bay, WI 54324

Defendant

Heth, Floyd, III

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Garnishee

Walmart

Po Box 82, Adp Garnishment

Bentonville, AR 72712

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Foscato, John Anthony

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice; Additional Text: Filed against defendant, Floyd Heth III and garnishee, Walmart.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 018704, Payable Number: 153109, Receipt Number: 22R 000728, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 018704, Payable Number: 153109, Receipt Number: 22R 000728, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice mailed; Additional Text: NEJ and OFIND mailed/electronically sent to parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 206451, Payable Number: 152090, Receipt Number: 21R 015441, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: MANITOWOC; Case number: 2021SC001066; Caption: Baycare Clinic LLP vs. Floyd Heth III; Total Amount: $1817.0; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Baycare Clinic LLP; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 28900, Green Bay, WI 54324 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Floyd Heth III; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1931 S. 39th St. Apt. 244, Manitowoc, WI 54220 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Electronic Filing Fee; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1433.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Garnishment costs; Amount: $112.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.; Additional Text: Attorney John Anthony Foscato appeared by letter for Baycare Clinic LLP, Defendant Floyd Heth III not in court. Minutes. Court grants default judgment to Plaintiff(s) against the defendant(s).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Zigmunt, Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 187685, Payable Number: 151486, Receipt Number: 21R 014304, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney; Additional Text: John A. Foscato requests Judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: with DMDC attachment as to Floyd Heth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: COVID-19 appearance information mailed to Defendant; electronically sent to Plaintiff.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Foscato, John Anthony