This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 11:57:12 (UTC).

Barron County Housing Authority vs. Nora J Danielson

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 Barron County Housing Authority filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Nora J Danielson. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Babler, James C and Amy Pavick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0452

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Babler, James C

Amy Pavick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barron County Housing Authority

611 Woodland Ave #25, Danielle E Maxwell-Parker, Dep Director

Barron, WI 54812

Defendant

Danielson, Nora J

Prairie Farm, WI 54762

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BARRON; Case number: 2021SC000452; Caption: Barron County Housing Authority vs. Nora J Danielson; Total Amount: $169.5; Judgment Party; Party Name: Nora J Danielson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 123 Hepburn St West Apt 4, Prairie Farm, WI 54762; Judgment Party; Party Name: Barron County Housing Authority; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 611 Woodland Ave #25, Danielle E Maxwell-Parker, Dep Director, Barron, WI 54812; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $75.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: BARRON; Case number: 2021SC000452; Caption: Barron County Housing Authority vs. Nora J Danielson; Property/Remarks: 123 Hepburn St West Apt #4 Prairie Farm WI 54762; Judgment Party; Party Name: Nora J Danielson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 123 Hepburn St West Apt 4, Prairie Farm, WI 54762; Judgment Party; Party Name: Barron County Housing Authority; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 611 Woodland Ave #25, Danielle E Maxwell-Parker, Dep Director, Barron, WI 54812

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Court trial; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Graupe, Adam; Additional Text: 10:04 AM Plaintiff Margaret Skemp with Barron County Housing Authority in court. Defendant Nora J Danielson in court. 10:04 both parties sworn. Written lease shown to Defendant. PL Exh #1 - Written Lease ; offered and received. PL Exh #2 - Notice of termination ; offered and received. PL Exh #3 - Certificate of Service; offered and received. 10:14 Russ Frie with Barron County Housing - manager of apartment called, sworn and Court questions. Defendant relates she plans to be out as soon as she finds a ride. Photos attached to the complaint shown on the screen. Court questions Mr Frie and describes the photos. Documents 2, 3, 4, 5 shown to the court on the screen. 10:23 cross by Defendant; Argument by Plaintiff Margaret Skemp for the Housing Authority Argumetnt by Defendant plans to move as soon as she can arrange the move. Court finds proper notice was given, proper grounds for eviction, and Eviction is granted and lease is terminated. Case workers at ADRC will be notified by Margaret S from the housing authority. Clerk will prepare the Judgment. $75 Service fees and filing fees to be added.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: 07/29/2021 service of summons and complaint on Nora J Danielson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after court trial; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: #1-Residential lease; #2-copy of notice of termination; #3-copy of COS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Tim Hafele, President of Prairie Farm Pioneer Housing Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on September 15, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Fornell, Laura; Additional Text: case e-forwarded to Judge and JA to schedule court trial (eviction case)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: of Nora Danielson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Fornell, Laura; Additional Text: 10:56 AM Defendant Nora J Danielson in court. Plaintiff Barron County Housing Authority not in court. Answer filed Reminder Note scheduled for August 23, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contested; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Fornell, Laura; Additional Text: To Be Set for court trial (eviction case)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Babler, James C.; Court Reporter: Fornell, Laura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: mn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 005623

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less