This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 00:49:07 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs. Jesus M Salgado

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Bank of America, N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jesus M Salgado. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hoel, Kari S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0033

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hoel, Kari S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of America, N.A.

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive, Ste 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Salgado, Jesus M

Fridley, MN 55421-1355

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Defendant Attorney

Robbins, Nicole L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Attorney Nicole Robbins for defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 030342, Payable Number: 152352, Receipt Number: 21R 002321, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: Sent for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Salgado, Jesus M; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Jesus M Salgado Current: 1357 53rd Ave NE, Fridley, MN 55421-1355 United States (Effective: 01-26-2021) Prior: 13367 44TH AVE, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: of Electronice Filing Notice and Summons and Complaint-Remailed-$2.00 mail fee owed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.; Additional Text: Regular mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 015010, Payable Number: 151863, Receipt Number: 21R 001011, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E