This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 05:30:00 (UTC).

Associated Bank, N.A. vs. Michael Neurer

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Associated Bank, N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Neurer. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Raihle, David, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0063

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Raihle, David, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Associated Bank, N.A.

1305 Main Street

Stevens Point, WI 54481

Defendant

Neurer, Michael

New Richmond, WI 54017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bartell, Thomas Michael, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 045993, Payable Number: 153228, Receipt Number: 21R 005007, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: of Notice of Hearing for Michael Neurer-Return to Sender-Not Deliverable as Addressed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2021SC000063; Caption: Associated Bank, N.A. vs. Michael Neurer; Total Amount: $1477.44; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Default judgment.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Michael Neurer; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 505 W 8th St, New Richmond, WI 54017; Judgment Party; Party Name: Associated Bank, N.A.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 1305 Main Street, Stevens Point, WI 54481 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $1093.96; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $113.98; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr; Additional Text: hearing; Attorney Geoff Estes appeared for Plaintiff via ZOOM; defendant did not appear; default judgment granted; minutes filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Raihle, David, Jr; Additional Text: on Request to Appear Remotely- approved PL's Attorney to appear remotely for 3/22 Hearing; copies to parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on March 22, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Chippewa County Small Claims Rules to be attached to Summons and Complaint for service upon defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Publication summons; Additional Text: filed by Attorney Thomas M. Bartell, Jr. - for 03/22/2021 at 1:00 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons and complaint; Additional Text: Personal Service - Plaintiff notified to file Chippewa County Small Claims Rules for service upon defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Neurer, Michael; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Michael Neurer Current: 505 W 8th St, New Richmond, WI 54017 (Effective: 02-15-2021) Prior: N8481 610th St, Colfax, WI 54730 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Chippewa County Small Claims Rules to be attached to Summons and Complaint for service upon defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on February 22, 2021 at 01:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Plaintiff notified to file Chippewa County Small Claims Rules to be served with Summons and Complaint - filed 01-27-2021 Personal Service required - out of county defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 015154, Payable Number: 151981, Receipt Number: 21R 001352, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bartell, Thomas Michael, Jr.