This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 08/22/2021 at 12:57:18 (UTC).

Ashley R Doering vs. Travis John Nastvold

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Ashley R Doering filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Travis John Nastvold. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Levine, Elliott M and Radtke, Pamela. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0925

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Levine, Elliott M

Radtke, Pamela

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doering, Ashley R

La Crosse, WI 54603

Defendant

Nastvold, Travis John

La Crosse, WI 54603

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC000925; Caption: Ashley R Doering vs. Travis John Nastvold; Total Amount: $194.5; Property/Remarks: 2006 George St. La Crosse WI 54603; Judgment Party; Party Name: Travis John Nastvold; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2006 George St., La Crosse, WI 54603; Judgment Party; Party Name: Ashley R Doering; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2006 George St., La Crosse, WI 54603; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $100.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: LA CROSSE; Case number: 2021SC000925; Caption: Ashley R Doering vs. Travis John Nastvold; Property/Remarks: 2006 George St. La Crosse WI 54603; Judgment Party; Party Name: Travis John Nastvold; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2006 George St., La Crosse, WI 54603; Judgment Party; Party Name: Ashley R Doering; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2006 George St., La Crosse, WI 54603

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 31001 (Sm Claim, Claim Under $ Limit) to 31004 (Small Claims, Eviction).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Court Official: Radtke, Pamela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 009848

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Amount: $100.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less