This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 01/21/2022 at 21:14:43 (UTC).

Ashland Empire, LLC vs. Rock River Food & Beverage Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 Ashland Empire, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Rock River Food Beverage Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Brantmeier, Bennett J and Hamre Incha, Cindy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0032

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Brantmeier, Bennett J

Hamre Incha, Cindy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashland Empire, LLC

3391 Nicolet Drive

Green Bay, WI 54311

Defendant

Rock River Food & Beverage Solutions, LLC

2200 Dickinson Road, Unit 115, C/O Lance E. Lins, Reg. Agent

Green Bay, WI 54302

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Petitjean, John R

Defendant Attorney

Flood, Brian T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: letter w/payment to ROD {11/10/21: to ROD w/DEED}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confirmation of sale; Court Official: Brantmeier, Bennett J.; Court Reporter: Rodencal, Kailee A.; Additional Text: {This hearing is being conducted via Zoom videoconferencing.} [Confirmation of Sale Hearing] [KS] case called at 9:53am Attorney John R Petitjean appeared by video means for Plaintiff Ashland Empire, LLC. No appearance by or for Defendant Rock River Food & Beverage Solutions, LLC. Court inquires as to a deficiency claim. Atty Petitjean presents information, including money judgment and replevin previously granted; Credit against previously filed judgment; AOM filed attached to NMM. Court reviews case and filings including Sheriff's report, value, debt & sale price, finds that sale is reasonably related to value . The Court authorizes a Writ if requested by Pltf. Court confirms the sale and endorses order as submitted. recess 10:00am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Brantmeier, Bennett J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order confirming sale; Court Official: Brantmeier, Bennett J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order confirming sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Sheriff's report of sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Sheriff's deed; Additional Text: w/RETR {11/10/21: to ROD w/check}

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of foreclosure sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of default; Additional Text: (Atty Petitjean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: /Mailing (Atty Petitjean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for judgment/prop. judgment; Additional Text: (Atty Petitjean)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 043147, Payable Number: 180022, Receipt Number: 21R 003831, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Flood for Rock River Food & Beverage Solutions, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: on Rock River Food & Beverage Solutions, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Lis pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 021489, Payable Number: 179310, Receipt Number: 21R 001988, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Flood, Brian T.