This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 23:52:52 (UTC).

Artisan and Truckers and Casualty Company vs. Clifton Hall et al

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 Artisan and Truckers and Casualty Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Clifton Hall. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Key, Barbara and Berry, Tara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0483

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Key, Barbara

Berry, Tara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Artisan and Truckers and Casualty Company

5920 Landerbrook Dr

Mayfield Heights, OH 44124

Defendants

Hall, Clifton

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Flowers, Ramona

Appleton, WI 54911

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anderson, Jennifer L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter Regarding Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Affidavit of Mailing Regarding Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000574, Payable Number: 313386, Receipt Number: 22R 000518, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter to plaintiff's attorney regarding docketing. Mailed to PL's attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment; Court Official: Berry, Tara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WINNEBAGO; Case number: 2021CV000483; Caption: Artisan and Truckers and Casualty Company vs. Clifton Hall et al; Total Amount: $18227.89; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Clifton Hall; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2909 E Park Ave, Chippewa Falls, WI 54729 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Artisan and Truckers and Casualty Company; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 5920 Landerbrook Dr, Mayfield Heights, Oh 44124 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $17358.65; Costs/Amount; Description: Civil filing fee; Amount: $285.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $328.74; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $250.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Key, Barbara; Additional Text: Clifton Hall only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Key, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of no answer

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Affidavit of Mailing of authenticated amended publication summons and authenticated summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of non-service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 395551, Payable Number: 304370, Receipt Number: 21R 022670, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anderson, Jennifer L.