This case was last updated from Outagamie County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 08:34:46 (UTC).

Appleton Emergency Services vs. Jaydin Dalimonte

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Appleton Emergency Services filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jaydin Dalimonte. This case was filed in Outagamie County Courts, Outagamie County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Budiac, Maureen Roberts. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1351

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Outagamie, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Budiac, Maureen Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Appleton Emergency Services

298 S Yonge St

Ormond Beach, FL 32174

Defendant

Dalimonte, Jaydin

Appleton, WI 54913

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fletcher, Christopher Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 246436, Payable Number: 400956, Receipt Number: 21R 254771, Amount: $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Jaydin Dalimonte - Judgment and Order for Financial Disclosure returned by mail "RTS Not Deliverable as Addressed / Unable to Forward"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts; Additional Text: Clerk remailed to address verbally updated by defendant on 6-24-21 [3300 E Paris Way Apt 3 Appleton WI 54913]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts; Additional Text: Clerk remailed to address verbally updated by defendant on 6-24-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: OUTAGAMIE; Case number: 2021SC001351; Caption: Appleton Emergency Services vs. Jaydin Dalimonte; Total Amount: $700.68; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Appleton Emergency Services; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 298 S Yonge St, Ormond Beach, FL 32174 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jaydin Dalimonte; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 3310 E. Paris Way #3, Appleton, WI 54913; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $529.18; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $50.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Dalimonte, Jaydin; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Jaydin Dalimonte Current: 3310 E. Paris Way #3, Appleton, WI 54913 United States (Effective: 06-07-2021) Prior: 1104 Cedar St, Little Chute, WI 54140 US

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts; Additional Text: Appearance by Plaintiff's Attorney Christopher Lee Fletcher by phone. Appearance by Defendant Jaydin Dalimonte by phone. Court grants default judgment in favor of Plaintiff.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Budiac, Maureen Roberts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Additional Text: Money $ 529.18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 167842, Payable Number: 397331, Receipt Number: 21R 248494, Amount: $116.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: to parties regarding their appearances at Return Date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fletcher, Christopher Lee