This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 18:58:32 (UTC).

Annie Camden vs. Outlaw Auto Sales LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 Annie Camden filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Outlaw Auto Sales LLC. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Novak, Nathan E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1042

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Novak, Nathan E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Camden, Annie

Altoona, WI 54720

Defendant

Outlaw Auto Sales LLC

559 N. Hastings Way

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Cormell, Jeffrey A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.; Additional Text: 10:30 AM All parties and court personnel appear via Zoom. Plaintiff Annie Camden appeared by video means. Dan Svee on behalf of Defendant Outlaw Auto Sales LLC appeared by video means with Attorney Jeffrey A Cormell who appeared by telephone. Referred to mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Mediation agreement; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.; Additional Text: Mediation agreement sent to Atty Cormell be eFiling on 09/07/2021; and to Plaintiff by mail on 09/08/2021. 9/8/21: Mediation agreement signed by Defendant 9/10/21: Mediation agreement signed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated dismissal; Court Official: Novak, Nathan E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing; Additional Text: at request of Bakke Norman Law Office for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 249175, Payable Number: 260263, Receipt Number: 21R 020373, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Notice of Retainer of Attorney Jeffrey Cormell on behalf of Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $96.5; Additional Text: 21R 018999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Amount: $4866.52; Additional Text: $2.00 mail fee provided for defendant(s), mailed defendant's copies on 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice; Additional Text: regarding remote appearance via Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Defendant's procedures

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cormell, Jeffrey A