This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 02/07/2022 at 02:09:25 (UTC).

ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES OF WISCONSIN RAPIDS S.C. vs. RENEE THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES OF WISCONSIN RAPIDS S C filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against RENEE THOMPSON. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kreuser, Jacalyn A and Wolf, Todd P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0765

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kreuser, Jacalyn A

Wolf, Todd P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES OF WISCONSIN RAPIDS S.C.

First Floor 225 S Executive Dr

Brookfield, WI 53005

Defendant

THOMPSON, RENEE

Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494

Garnishee

Wisconsin Illinois Senior Housing Inc

13185 W Green Mountain Dr

Lakewood, CO 80228

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schaefer, Emma Nicole

Schaefer, Emma N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000980, Payable Number: 131943, Receipt Number: 22R 000703, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000980, Payable Number: 131943, Receipt Number: 22R 000703, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 009501, Payable Number: 129471, Receipt Number: 21R 009073, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WOOD; Case number: 2021SC000765; Caption: ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES OF WISCONSIN RAPIDS S.C. vs. RENEE THOMPSON; Total Amount: $2375.36; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: RENEE THOMPSON; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 440 WYATT AVE, Wisconsin Rapids, WI 54494 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES OF WISCONSIN RAPIDS S.C.; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: First Floor 225 S Executive Dr, Brookfield, WI 53005 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2042.86; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $63.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 02:08 PM Attorney Matthew Prior in court for Plaintiff ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES OF WISCONSIN RAPIDS S.C.. Defendant RENEE THOMPSON not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Wolf, Todd P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Wolf, Todd P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $63.0; Additional Text: 09/04/21; Renee Thompson; SC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $2042.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008471, Payable Number: 128776, Receipt Number: 21R 008014, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schaefer, Emma N.