This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 01:17:40 (UTC).

Andry Rasmussen & Sons Inc vs. Theodore G Mathews Jr

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 Andry Rasmussen Sons Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Theodore G Mathews Jr. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Yackel, John M and Gorney, Caryn A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0100

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Yackel, John M

Gorney, Caryn A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andry Rasmussen & Sons Inc

42940 Us Hwy 63, Po Box 66

Cable, WI 54821

Defendant

Mathews, Theodore G, Jr

Hayward, WI 54843

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Gorney, Caryn A; Additional Text: 10:00 AM: Plaintiff Andry Rasmussen & Sons Inc appeared by phone means. Defendant Theodore G Mathews appeared in person. DEF contests claim. Court Trial set for 8/5/2021 at 2:00 p.m. Plaintiff's witnesses will be: Amy Runice and David Popelka (Service Department at Andry Rasmussen & Sons).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Appearance; Court Official: Gorney, Caryn A; Additional Text: DEF appeared to contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal; Additional Text: with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on August 5, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Proposed Exhibit - Correspondence regarding payment to DEF from Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response/reply; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Reply to Counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Received via USPS mail today

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contested; Additional Text: DEF filed Answer to contest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service by return receipt; Additional Text: 7020 0090 0001 4198 7433

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by certified mail; Additional Text: Claim for $886.86

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $122.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001313, Payable Number: 66703, Receipt Number: 21R 002418, Amount: $122.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certified mail service; Additional Text: 7020 0090 0001 4198 7433

    Read MoreRead Less