This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 02:19:11 (UTC).

Andrea Belille et al vs. La Verda Luedtke et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Andrea Belille filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against La Verda Luedtke. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Yackel, John M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0058

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Yackel, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Belille, Andrea

Superior, WI 54880

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Luedtke, La Verda

Hayward, WI 54843

ABC Insurance Company

Unknown

Hayward, WI 54843

Byrne, Mike

Hayward, WI 54843

DEF Insurance Company

Unknown

Hayward, WI 54843

3Rd Party Defendants

Belille, Andrew

Hayward, WI 54843

Belille, Ursula

Hayward, WI 54843

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tool, Tracy Neil

Defendant Attorneys

Lein, Curtiss Norman

Mulligan, Thomas O., Sr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Location: Sawyer County Courthouse LCR; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Telephone status conference; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Court Reporter: Biskup, Candace; Additional Text: 10:53 AM Court calls case and recites appearances. Attorney Tracy Neil Tool appeared by video means for Plaintiff Andrea Belille. Attorney Thomas O. Mulligan appeared by video means for Defendant Mike Byrne. Attorney Curtiss Norman Lein appeared by phone means for Defendant La Verda Luedtke. Defendant Mike Byrne appeared by phone means. Third party plaintiff Mike Byrne appeared by phone means. Atty Tool gives status update. Would like another status/scheduling conference in approx 6 months. Atty Mulligan and Atty Lein in agreement. Court sets status/scheduling conference. Status conference scheduled for May 12, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on May 12, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on May 12, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone status conference on November 22, 2021 at 10:45 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: of Defendant La Verda Luedtke

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001642, Payable Number: 66972, Receipt Number: 21R 002977, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Real Estate Lease

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Belille, Andrew; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Andrew Belille Current: 15934 W Park Rd Lot 11, Hayward, WI 54843 United States (Effective: 05-18-2021) Prior: 15934 W Park Rd, Hayward, WI 54843 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $72.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001511, Payable Number: 66889, Receipt Number: 21R 002839, Amount: $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001407, Payable Number: 66820, Receipt Number: 21R 002622, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mulligan, Thomas O., Sr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lein, Curtiss Norman