This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 23:15:47 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs. Steven Hanson

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Steven Hanson. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Grill, Leo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0078

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Grill, Leo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

622 N Water St #400, C/O Gurstel Law Firm

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant

Hanson, Steven

Baraboo, WI 53913

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Procaccio, Anthony J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002778, Payable Number: 237931, Receipt Number: 21R 005734, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Clerk Instruction Letter; amended judgment request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Grill, Leo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Grill, Leo; Additional Text: Amended Judgment/Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SAUK; Case number: 2021SC000078; Caption: American Express National Bank vs. Steven Hanson; Total Amount: $7868.88; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Judgment entered on February 17, 2021 is amended to remove the attorney fee of $150.00.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Steven Hanson; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 522 15th St, Baraboo, WI 53913 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: American Express National Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 622 N Water St #400, c/o Gurstel Law Firm, Milwaukee, WI 53202 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $7694.38; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $60.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $20.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Grill, Leo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Grill, Leo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Grill, Leo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Grill, Leo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: on Steven Lester Hanson; $60.00 SF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: Money demand for $7,694.38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000600, Payable Number: 236303, Receipt Number: 21R 001133, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Procaccio, Anthony J