This case was last updated from Chippewa County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 00:33:14 (UTC).

American Express National Bank vs. Ronnie Rihn

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 American Express National Bank filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ronnie Rihn. This case was filed in Chippewa County Courts, Chippewa County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hoel, Kari S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0340

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chippewa, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hoel, Kari S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Express National Bank

622 N Water St #400, C/O Gurstel Law Firm P.C.

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendants

Rihn, Ronnie

Bloomer, WI 54724

Rihn, Ronnie P

Bloomer, WI 54724

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaminsky, Stephen M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Satisfaction of judgment fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 154329, Payable Number: 158061, Receipt Number: 21R 016179, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Full satisfaction; Amount: $6630.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: CHIPPEWA; Case number: 2021SC000340; Caption: American Express National Bank vs. Ronnie Rihn; Total Amount: $6630.24; Satisfaction: Full; Property/Remarks: Default judgment.; Judgment Party; Party Name: Ronnie Rihn; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2907 190th Ave, Bloomer, WI 54724 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: American Express National Bank; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 622 N Water St #400, c/o Gurstel Law Firm P.C., Milwaukee, WI 53202 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $6513.74; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-10-21; Type: Full satisfaction; Amount: $6630.24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.; Additional Text: hearing; Attorney David Hellman appeared for plainitff; defendant did not appear; default judgment granted; minutes filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail; Court Official: Hoel, Kari S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 061201, Payable Number: 153894, Receipt Number: 21R 006812, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaminsky, Stephen M.