This case was last updated from Sheboygan County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 22:01:35 (UTC).

Acuity vs. Gingerich & Sons LLC

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Acuity filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gingerich Sons LLC. This case was filed in Sheboygan County Courts, Sheboygan County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Schaubel, Susan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1019

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sheboygan, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Schaubel, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acuity

2800 S. Taylor Drive

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Defendant

Gingerich & Sons LLC

N7250 Albany I, C/O Rudy J. Gingerich, R.A.

Mondovi, WI 54755

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zall, Darrell Robert

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 016112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010423, Payable Number: 356174, Receipt Number: 21R 015792, Amount: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: SHEBOYGAN; Case number: 2021SC001019; Caption: Acuity vs. Gingerich & Sons LLC; Total Amount: $3758.86; Satisfaction: No; Judgment Party; Party Name: Gingerich & Sons LLC; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: N7250 Albany I, c/o Rudy J. Gingerich, R.A., Mondovi, WI 54755 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Acuity; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2800 S. Taylor Drive, Sheboygan, WI 53081 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $3419.36; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $75.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-08-24; Type: Transcript issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: 08:55 AM Money judgment for plaintiff by default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of substitute service; Additional Text: to Ester Gingerich-employer/owner $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Court Official: Schaubel, Susan; Additional Text: $3419.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: From Court to all litigants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 008388, Payable Number: 354690, Receipt Number: 21R 012934, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zall, Darrell Robert