This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 01:23:05 (UTC).

Acuity Insurance, A Mutual Company vs. Harry A. Berndt

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Acuity Insurance, A Mutual Company filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Harry A Berndt. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Yackel, John M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0054

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Yackel, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acuity Insurance, A Mutual Company

2800 South Taylor Drive

Sheboygan, WI 53081

Defendant

Berndt, Harry A.

Portage, IN 46368

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Harmeyer, Ronald W

DeStefanis, Nicholas John

Defendant Attorney

Crocker, Timothy J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/prop. order of dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/order of dismissal; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: dismissed with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Yackel, John M.; Additional Text: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001975, Payable Number: 67326, Receipt Number: 21R 003685, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $72.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001976, Payable Number: 67326, Receipt Number: 21R 003685, Amount: $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: of Harry Berndt by Process Server, M Smith on 5/16/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001372, Payable Number: 66779, Receipt Number: 21R 002541, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less