This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 02/02/2022 at 06:55:26 (UTC).

Achilles Finance LLC dba Advance Financial vs. Lori Boyer

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Achilles Finance LLC dba Advance Financial filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lori Boyer. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr and Kreuser, Jacalyn A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0171

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr

Kreuser, Jacalyn A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Achilles Finance LLC dba Advance Financial

100 Oceanside Dr

Nashville, TN 37204

Defendant

Boyer, Lori

Marshfield, WI 54449

Garnishee

Marshfield Clinic Health System Inc

1000 N Oak Ave

Marshfield, WI 54449

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

bruck, deborah krusche

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Earnings garnishment notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004687, Payable Number: 126180, Receipt Number: 21R 004259, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $92.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004687, Payable Number: 126180, Receipt Number: 21R 004259, Amount: $92.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: WOOD; Case number: 2021SC000171; Caption: Achilles Finance LLC dba Advance Financial vs. Lori Boyer; Total Amount: $3025.05; Judgment Party; Party Name: Lori Boyer; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 2315 S Wallonnie Dr, Marshfield, WI 54449 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Achilles Finance LLC dba Advance Financial; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 100 Oceanside Dr, Nashville, TN 37204 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $2680.55; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $80.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Attorney fee; Amount: $150.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A; Additional Text: 01:47 PM Attorney Luke Weiland in court for Plaintiff Achilles Finance LLC dba Advance Financial. Defendant Lori Boyer not in court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Kreuser, Jacalyn A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: from Atty Youra to amend the judgment by $100 payment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: AFF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $2780.55; Additional Text: $2,780.55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001730, Payable Number: 124691, Receipt Number: 21R 001849, Amount: $114.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruck, Deborah Krusche