This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/03/2022 at 16:21:45 (UTC).

A-1 Restaurant Equipment Services, Inc. vs. Bilda's Freiss Lake Pub & Market

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 A-1 Restaurant Equipment Services, Inc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Bilda's Freiss Lake Pub Market. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Pouros, James G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0407

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Pouros, James G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-1 Restaurant Equipment Services, Inc.

7373 S. 6Th St

Oak Creek, WI 53154

Defendant

Bilda's Freiss Lake Pub & Market

4493 Wi 167

Hubertus, WI 53033

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Pouros, James G.; Additional Text: with prejudice; copy mailed to defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial; Court Official: Pouros, James G.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Pre-trial/scheduling conference; Court Official: Pouros, James G.; Court Reporter: Lopez, Katherine M.; Additional Text: Plaintiff A-1 Restaurant Equipment Services, Inc. in court by Tyler Wallsworth. Defendant Bilda's Freiss Lake Pub & Market in court by Victoria Bilda. Clerk: EZ. Parties reached stipulation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of appearance by plaintiff; Additional Text: filed by Terry Martinez, Owner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Authorization to appear, filed by Plaintiff, dated 7/16/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial/scheduling conference on July 22, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Invoices & Interest Spreadsheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $55.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint on Bilda's Freiss Lake Pub & Market on 4/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from T Martinez, dated 4/15/21, indicating Tracy Bower and Tyler Wadsworth are agents for Terry Martinez, Owner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Amount: $2017.11; Additional Text: Return Date: 5/10/21 at 9:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $114.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 059085, Payable Number: 155125, Receipt Number: 21R 008287, Amount: $114.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less