This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 21:30:13 (UTC).

2112 Property Mgmt LLC vs. Susan Grams

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 2112 Property Mgmt LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Susan Grams. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Seim, Steven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0487

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Seim, Steven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2112 Property Mgmt LLC

Po Box 442

Watertown, WI 53094

Defendant

Grams, Susan

Beaver Dam, WI 53916

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ returned satisfied; Additional Text: $90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: DODGE; Case number: 2021SC000487; Caption: 2112 Property Mgmt LLC vs. Susan Grams; Total Amount: $169.5; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Judgment for eviction of: Susan Grams 217 1/2 Jackson St. Beaver Dam, WI 53916; Judgment Party; Party Name: Susan Grams; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 217 1/2 Jackson St, Beaver Dam, WI 53916; Judgment Party; Party Name: 2112 Property Mgmt LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 442, Watertown, WI 53094; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $65.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $94.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Other; Amount: $5.0; Costs/Amount; Description: Docketing fee; Amount: $5.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for eviction; County: DODGE; Case number: 2021SC000487; Caption: 2112 Property Mgmt LLC vs. Susan Grams; Satisfaction: No; Property/Remarks: Judgment for eviction of: Susan Grams 217 1/2 Jackson St. Beaver Dam, WI 53916; Judgment Party; Party Name: Susan Grams; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 217 1/2 Jackson St, Beaver Dam, WI 53916; Judgment Party; Party Name: 2112 Property Mgmt LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: PO Box 442, Watertown, WI 53094; Civil Judgement Events; Date: 2021-05-07; Type: Writ of restitution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Eviction return date; Court Official: Seim, Steven; Court Reporter: Recording System; Additional Text: Plaintiff 2112 Property Mgmt LLC in court by Larry Frahm. Defendant Susan Grams not in court. Default judgment granted for eviction requested plus applicable court costs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Docket fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 008581

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution fee paid; Amount: $5.0; Additional Text: 21R 008581

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Writ of restitution; Court Official: Seim, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: $65

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 007280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $2.0; Additional Text: 21R 007280

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less