This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/10/2017 05:17:33

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/19/2011 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by DISCOVER BANK against RON LOVE in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number 30-2011-00492130-CL-CL-CJC
  • Filing Date 07/19/2011
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Central Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant MANA CONCEPTS INC.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff DISCOVER BANK
  • Represented By
    • GORDON & WONG LAW GROUP
  • Defendant RON LOVE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY DI...

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY DI...

Fees Apply
SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 06/02/201...

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 06/02/201...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07...

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK JUDGMENT PACKAGE) SUBMIT...

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK JUDGMENT PACKAGE) SUBMIT...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/0...

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/0...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, T...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, T...

Fees Apply
PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AM...

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AM...

Fees Apply
MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT...

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT...

Fees Apply
JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07/2012

JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07/2012

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: UNDERLYING ACTION FOR OPEN BOOK ACC...

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: UNDERLYING ACTION FOR OPEN BOOK ACC...

Fees Apply
DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: INTEREST) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON...

DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: INTEREST) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON...

Fees Apply
ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/10/14) RECEIVED ON 01/09/2014...

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/10/14) RECEIVED ON 01/09/2014...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2014
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 06/02/2014
  • 06/03/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3151450 RECEIVED ON 06/02/2014 03:56:56 PM.
  • 01/10/2014
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11525129 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11348956.
  • 01/09/2014
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED 1/10/14) RECEIVED ON 01/09/2014.
  • 01/10/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1140065 RECEIVED ON 01/09/2014 03:17:25 PM.
  • 12/27/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - PARTIALLY SATISFIED FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 12/27/2013
  • 06/30/2013
  • CASE TRANSFERRED FROM HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - LAGUNA HILLS TO CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER, EFFECTIVE 07/01/2013.
  • 01/17/2013
  • WRIT ISSUED.
  • 01/17/2013
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11299554 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11123446.
  • 01/15/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 01/15/2013
  • 01/17/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 138315 RECEIVED ON 01/15/2013 09:25:56 AM.
  • 03/07/2012
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK
  • 03/07/2012
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.
  • 03/07/2012
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FOR DISCOVER BANK IN THE AMOUNT OF 9576.40 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 303.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST LOVE, RON ;MANA CONCEPTS INC..
  • 03/07/2012
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07/2012
  • 03/07/2012
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: UNDERLYING ACTION FOR OPEN BOOK ACCOUNT) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07/2012
  • 03/07/2012
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (RE: INTEREST) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07/2012
  • 03/07/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07/2012
  • 03/07/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY DISCOVER BANK ON 03/07/2012
  • 02/23/2012
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK JUDGMENT PACKAGE) SUBMITTED BY DISCOVER BANK REJECTED ON 02/23/2012.