This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 04:01:04

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by JORDAN MECHNER against WHITNEY HILLS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number BD653303
  • Filing Date 01/25/2017
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Respondent HILLS WHITNEY
  • Represented By
    • RUTTER MARSHALL ANTHONY
  • Petitioner MECHNER JORDAN
  • Represented By
    • RYDEN WILLIAM SHAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Attorney
  • 06/26/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Attorney
  • 05/17/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170
  • 05/17/2017
  • Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure
  • 05/17/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations and Waivers
  • 04/14/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - Stipulated
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mechner, Jordan ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 02/08/2017
  • Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (Summons & Petition - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mechner, Jordan - Signed on 2017-01-26 ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 02/07/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mail (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hills, Whitney ); Filed by Respondent
  • 02/07/2017
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 02-16-17 )
  • 02/07/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hills, Whitney ); Filed by Respondent
  • 02/07/2017
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Hills, Whitney - Filed and Entered on 2017-02-07 ); Filed by Respondent
  • 01/26/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 02-16-17 )
  • 01/25/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mechner, Jordan ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/25/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Mechner, Jordan ); Filed by Petitioner