This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 05:10:59 (UTC).

USF Federal Credit Union v. Gateway Radiology Consultants

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 USF Federal Credit Union filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Gateway Radiology Consultants. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-13462

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

USF FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant / Appellee

GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Adam M. Gilbert

Attorney at Underwood Murray, PA

100 N Tampa St Ste 2325

Tampa, FL 33602

Megan Wilson Murray

Attorney at Underwood Murray, PA

100 N Tampa St Ste 2325

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Thomas G. Zeichman

Attorney at Beighley Myrick Udell & Lynne, PA

2385 Executive Center Dr Ste 250

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Maury L. Udell

Attorney at Beighley Myrick Udell & Lynne, PA

150 W Flagler St Ste 1800

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Megan Wilson Murray for USF Federal Credit Union. [20-13462] (ECF: Megan Murray) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua M. Salzman for Jovita Carranza, in her capacity as Administrator for the U.S. Small Business Administration [20-13462] (ECF: Joshua Salzman) [Entered: 09/17/2020 12:00 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas G. Zeichman for Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.. [20-13462] (ECF: Thomas Zeichman) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:47 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Maury L. Udell for Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.. [20-13462] (ECF: Maury Udell) [Entered: 09/16/2020 11:46 AM]

Open Document #4

Order granting 158(d)

Open Document #3

DKT-12 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Megan Wilson Murray for USF Federal Credit Union. [20-13462] (ECF: Megan Murray) [Entered: 09/17/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Joshua M. Salzman for Jovita Carranza, in her capacity as Administrator for the U.S. Small Business Administration [20-13462] (ECF: Joshua Salzman) [Entered: 09/17/2020 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas G. Zeichman for Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.. [20-13462] (ECF: Thomas Zeichman) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Maury L. Udell for Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.. [20-13462] (ECF: Maury Udell) [Entered: 09/16/2020 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant USF Federal Credit Union on 09/16/2020. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 09/30/2020 as to Appellant USF Federal Credit Union. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/14/2020 as to Appellee Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. [Entered: 09/16/2020 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less