This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2019 08:36:36

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 a Other case was filed by CHADWICK MCQUEEN against FERRARI N in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number BC715754
  • Filing Date 07/30/2018
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Other
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge GREGORY W. ALARCON
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner MCQUEEN CHADWICK
  • Represented By
    • BROWNE GEORGE ROSS LLP
  • Plaintiff CITY NATIONAL BANK (TRUSTEE OF TERRY
  • Represented By
    • BROWNE GEORGE ROSS LLP
  • Defendant FERRARI N.V.
  • Represented By
    • DLA PIPER US LLP
  • Petitioner CITY NATIONAL BANK (TRUSTEE OF TERRY
  • Represented By
    • BROWNE GEORGE ROSS LLP
  • Respondent FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC.
  • Represented By
    • DLA PIPER US LLP
  • Respondent DEOS 1 TO 10
  • Represented By
    • DLA PIPER US LLP
  • Defendant DEOS 1 TO 10
  • Represented By
    • DLA PIPER US LLP
    • DEUTSCH ANDREW LAWRENCE
  • Plaintiff MCQUEEN CHADWICK
  • Represented By
    • BROWNE GEORGE ROSS LLP
  • Respondent FERRARI N.V.
  • Represented By
    • DLA PIPER US LLP
  • Defendant FERRARI NORTH AMERICA INC.
  • Represented By
    • DLA PIPER US LLP
    • DEUTSCH ANDREW LAWRENCE

Court Documents

SUMMONS

7/30/2018: SUMMONS

Fees Apply
PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC, SE...

8/7/2018: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV...

Fees Apply
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give ...

11/5/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plainti...

Fees Apply
NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

9/12/2018: NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FED...

Fees Apply
NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

9/12/2018: NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDE...

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/24/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

7/30/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

Fees Apply
Minute Order

12/3/2018: Minute Order

Fees Apply
Minute Order

8/10/2018: Minute Order

Fees Apply
COMPLAINT FOR: (1) TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT 115 U.S.C. 1114]; ...

7/30/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT 115 U.S...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 96, Anthony Mohr, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk
  • 11/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk
  • 09/12/2018
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Ferrari North America, Inc. (Defendant)
  • 09/12/2018
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Ferrari North America, Inc. (Defendant)
  • 09/12/2018
  • NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT
  • 09/12/2018
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT
  • 08/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
  • 08/24/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk
  • 08/21/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons
  • 08/21/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC. ON FERRARI NORTH AMERICA, INC.
  • 08/10/2018
  • at 09:35 AM in Department 36; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held
  • 08/10/2018
  • Minute Order
  • 08/10/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk
  • 08/07/2018
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC, SECTION 170.6)
  • 08/07/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 07/30/2018
  • SUMMONS
  • 07/30/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT 115 U.S.C. 1114]; ETC
  • 07/30/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Chadwick McQueen (Plaintiff); City National Bank (Trustee of Terry (Plaintiff)
  • 07/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT