This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 00:25:40

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by DEL ROSARIO, THERESA PARAS against DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number 18LBFL00332
  • Filing Date 03/05/2018
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Courthouse Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Petitioner DEL ROSARIO THERESA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Respondent DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Petitioner DEL ROSARIO THERESA PARAS
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner
  • 04/16/2019
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner
  • 03/15/2019
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner
  • 03/15/2019
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/22/2019
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/04/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Amended Petition; Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/04/2019
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure (amended ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 01/03/2019
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )
  • 12/10/2018
  • Petition - Amended (1st) (Petitioner: Name Changes ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/10/2018
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property (amended ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/10/2018
  • Summons - Amended; Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/10/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense (amended ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 12/10/2018
  • Declaration - Separate Property (amended ); Filed by Petitioner
  • 10/22/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner
  • 10/11/2018
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner
  • 10/11/2018
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner
  • 10/11/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner
  • 10/09/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner
  • 10/09/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner
  • 03/28/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner