Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/19/2020 at 05:11:57 (UTC).

Hedilberto Vargas v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Hedilberto Vargas filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-72443

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HEDILBERTO ANTONIO VARGAS

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Karla L. Kraus Esquire

Attorney at Kraus Law Corporation

325 W. Washington St., Suite 2170

San Diego, CA 92103

Respondent Attorneys

Rebecca Hoffberg Phillips

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Counseled Immigration Packet

1 #2

Petition for Review and Motion for Stay of Removal

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) Added Attorney(s) Rebecca Hoffberg Phillips for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, in case 20-72443. [11790696] (NAC) [Entered: 08/17/2020 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Rebecca Hoffberg Phillips (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division, Office of Immigration Litigation, P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station, Washington, DC 20044) for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 08/17/2020. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [11790610] [20-72443] (Phillips, Rebecca) [Entered: 08/17/2020 08:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 09/18/2020. Response to motion for stay due 10/09/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 11/17/2020 for Hedilberto Antonio Vargas. Respondent brief due 01/19/2021 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11790531] (BY) [Entered: 08/17/2020 06:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less