Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/02/2020 at 05:27:54 (UTC).

Lazarchuk v. Barr

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Lazarchuk filed an Other lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-9598

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROMAN MIKHYALOVICH LAZARCHUK

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Stephen W. Spurgin

310 North Mesa

El Paso, TX 79901

Respondent Attorneys

Lansing W. Tyler

Attorney at DHS Immigration and Customs Enforcement

12445 East Caley Avenue, Jim Bailey Building

Centennial, CO 80111

Kristin Moresi

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

DOH/EOIR/BIA

Attorney at Attn: Certification Unit

P.O. Box 8530

Falls Church, VA 22041

Oil Oil

Attorney at Department of Justice

450 5Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

Petition for Review Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

PFR

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766853] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Kristin Moresi for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 09/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9598] [Entered: 09/01/2020 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket[10766825] Entry of appearance submitted by Kristin Moresi for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 09/01/2020. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 09/01/2020 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [20-9598] KM [Entered: 09/01/2020 07:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766772] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen W. Spurgin for Roman Mikhyalovich Lazarchuk. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-9598] [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10766768] Petition for review filed. Served on 08/31/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 08/31/2020 letter. Docketing statement due 09/14/2020 for Roman Mikhyalovich Lazarchuk. Agency record due 10/13/2020 for William P. Barr. Fee is due by 09/14/2020 for Roman Mikhyalovich Lazarchuk. Notice of appearance due on 09/14/2020 for William P. Barr and Roman Mikhyalovich Lazarchuk [20-9598] [Entered: 08/31/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less