This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:02:18 (UTC).

Nana Yaw Amo v. William P. Barr

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Nana Yaw Amo filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against William P Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1637

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NANA YAW AMO

Kenosha, WI 53144

Respondents and Respondent / Appellees

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States

MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, Acting Attorney General of the United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nana Yaw Amo

Attorney at KENOSHA COUNTY DETENTION CENTER

4777 88Th Avenue

Kenosha, WI 53144

Respondent and Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Kristin A. Moresi

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

Oil OIL

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0000

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER re: Various motions. This court has denied petitioner's requests for a stay of removal three times, and also denied his multiple requests to proceed in forma pauperis. His most recent requests contain no new information that the court has not already considered or that would provide a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. Therefore, the motions are DENIED. [ # 16 ] The appellant must pay the required docketing fee or this appeal will be dismissed pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). [ # 15 ]; Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 1721. WLS [18] [7003022] [19-1637] (AG) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:11 PM]

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER re: Motion to request a stay of removal. This court has denied the petitioner's request for a stay of removal two times, and his third request does not add any new information. Therefore, the motion is DENIED. WLS [ # 13 ] [14] [7001424] [19-1637] (VG) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:46 AM]

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

(#12) ORDER re: 1. Motion to reconsider stay of removal. 2. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. The petitioner is reminded that he must pay the filing fee by May 1, 2019, or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). [ # 10 ] [ # 9 ]; Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 2230. WLS [12] [7000804] [19-1637] (AP) [Entered: 04/26/2019 12:08 PM]

11 #2

CAR 1 of 1

11 #1

index

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) ORDER re: Motion to reconsider motion to appeal in forma pauperis. [ # 7 ] IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. The petitioner's original motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis was not denied for lack of indigence; it was denied because the court concluded that the petitioner failed to identify a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. Nothing in the present motion warrants a different conclusion. The petitioner shall pay the required docketing fee by May 1, 2019, or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute in accordance with Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1334 2498. WLS [8] [6999703] [19-1637] (VG) [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:34 AM]

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ORDER: re: 1. Motion to stay removal. 2. Motion for attorney representation. 3. Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. [ # 4 ] [ # 3 ] [ # 2 ]; The motion for stay of removal is DENIED. The motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. The petitioner shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 70160340000113342481. WLS [6] [6996822] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/10/2019 09:18 AM]

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER re: Various motions. This court has denied petitioner's requests for a stay of removal three times, and also denied his multiple requests to proceed in forma pauperis. His most recent requests contain no new information that the court has not already considered or that would provide a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. Therefore, the motions are DENIED. [ # 16 ] The appellant must pay the required docketing fee or this appeal will be dismissed pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). [ # 15 ]; Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 1721. WLS [18] [7003022] [19-1637] (AG) [Entered: 05/07/2019 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Filed Statement by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo [17] [7002873] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 05/07/2019 09:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Prose motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [16] [7002830] [19-1637] (CMD) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for stay of removal. [15] [7002829] [19-1637] (CMD) [Entered: 05/06/2019 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER re: Motion to request a stay of removal. This court has denied the petitioner's request for a stay of removal two times, and his third request does not add any new information. Therefore, the motion is DENIED. WLS [ # 13 ] [14] [7001424] [19-1637] (VG) [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for stay of removal. [13] [7001181] [19-1637] (VG) [Entered: 04/29/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re: 1. Motion to reconsider stay of removal. 2. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. IT IS ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. The petitioner is reminded that he must pay the filing fee by May 1, 2019, or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). [ # 10 ] [ # 9 ]; Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7018 0680 0002 2683 2230. WLS [12] [7000804] [19-1637] (AP) [Entered: 04/26/2019 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Certified Administrative Record filed by the Executive Office for Immigration Review. Petitioner detained: Yes. [7000485] [19-1637] (Executive Office Of Immigration Review, DOJ) [Entered: 04/25/2019 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Prose motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [10] [6999851] [19-1637] (CMD) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to reconsider stay of removal. [9] [6999850] [19-1637] (CMD) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re: Motion to reconsider motion to appeal in forma pauperis. [ # 7 ] IT IS ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. The petitioner's original motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis was not denied for lack of indigence; it was denied because the court concluded that the petitioner failed to identify a potentially meritorious argument for appeal. Nothing in the present motion warrants a different conclusion. The petitioner shall pay the required docketing fee by May 1, 2019, or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute in accordance with Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7016 0340 0001 1334 2498. WLS [8] [6999703] [19-1637] (VG) [Entered: 04/23/2019 09:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to reconsider permission to appeal in forma pauperis. [7] [6999317] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/19/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: re: 1. Motion to stay removal. 2. Motion for attorney representation. 3. Affidavit accompanying motion for permission to appeal in forma pauperis. [ # 4 ] [ # 3 ] [ # 2 ]; The motion for stay of removal is DENIED. The motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. The petitioner shall pay the required docketing fee within 14 days or else this appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Circuit Rule 3(b). Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 70160340000113342481. WLS [6] [6996822] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/10/2019 09:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Appearance form filed by Attorney Kristin Moresi for Appellee William P. Barr. [5] [6996582] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [19-1637] --[Edited 04/09/2019 by AP- to reflect addition of counsel] (Moresi, Kristin) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Prose motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. [4] [6996298] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for attorney representation. [3] [6996295] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Pro se motion filed by Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo for stay of removal. [2] [6996294] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition for Review docketed with proof of service, pursuant to FRAP 15(c). Fee due. Agency record or certified list due by 05/20/2019. Fee or IFP forms due on 04/22/2019 for Petitioner Nana Yaw Amo. [1] [6996280] [19-1637] (CAG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less