This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2019 16:12:48

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by EUGENE KIM against ZALEMARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number 18STCV07928
  • Filing Date 12/11/2018
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant ZALEMARK HOLDING COMPANY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION
  • Represented By
    • CHAN FRANKY
  • Plaintiff KIM EUGENE
  • Represented By
    • THOMPSON ROBERT WALTER
    • CHAN FRANKY

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CF ...

9/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFE...

Free with Subscription
Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-C...

7/19/2019: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved a...

Free with Subscription
Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION T...

10/11/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIF...

Free with Subscription
Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEA...

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...

Free with Subscription
Declaration - DECLARATION OF JIWON M. SHIN REQUESTING CONTIN...

10/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JIWON M. SHIN REQUE...

Free with Subscription
Order - ORDER CONTINUING DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING

11/4/2019: Order - ORDER CONTINUING DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING

Free with Subscription
Proof of Service by Mail

8/9/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Fees Apply
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/11/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Fees Apply
Notice of Status Conference and Order

12/31/2018: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Fees Apply
Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND P...

4/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFER...

Fees Apply
Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (CF ...

7/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...

Fees Apply
Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved a...

4/22/2019: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • 12/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Default Prove Up Hearing
  • 11/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court
  • 11/05/2019
  • at 5:19 PM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Court Order
  • 11/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Order Continuing Default Prove-Up Hearing Set...)); Filed by Clerk
  • 11/04/2019
  • Order (continuing default prove-up hearing); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)
  • 10/30/2019
  • Declaration ( OF JIWON M. SHIN REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF THE DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 8, 2019 AT 8:30 A.M.); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)
  • 10/11/2019
  • Notice of Ruling ( RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER OF DEFENDANT ZALEMARK HOLDING COMPANY, INC. AND ENTER ITS DEFAULT); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)
  • 10/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (Answer of defendant Zalemark Holding Company, Inc. and enter its default.) - Held - Motion Granted
  • 10/09/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court
  • 10/09/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion to Strike Answe...)); Filed by Clerk
  • 09/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion
  • 09/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer (Not filed, wrong entry) - Not Held - Vacated by Court
  • 09/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (Answer of defendant Zalemark Holding Company, Inc. and enter its default.) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion
  • 09/27/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike Answer of defendant Zalemark Hold...)); Filed by Clerk
  • 09/24/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance of Motion to Strike Answer); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)
  • 09/11/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)
  • 09/04/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)
  • 09/04/2019
  • Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by Eugene Kim (Plaintiff)
  • 09/03/2019
  • at 11:36 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order
  • 09/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Case Management Conference ((cf 5/2/19- pln'ts atty to give ntc)) - Held