This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2016 16:19:12

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/12/2001 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by DEL ROSARIO, GLORIA against DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number 01S00431
  • Filing Date 03/12/2001
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge ALBERT D. MATTHEWS
  • Courthouse Bellflower Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff DEL ROSARIO GLORIA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.
  • 10/11/2001
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ISSUED 112801 . RECEIPT # PAID .
  • 09/07/2001
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO) .
  • 09/06/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. ALBERT D. MATTHEWS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING X . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT.
  • 09/06/2001
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/06/01 . FOR (DEL ROSARIO, GLORIA) . AGAINST (DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO) . PRINCIPAL $ 5000.00 . COSTS $ 50.00 . TOTAL $ 5050.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.
  • 08/14/2001
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .
  • 08/14/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 09/06/01 AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 002 . RECEIPT # 00
  • 08/13/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. ALBERT D. MATTHEWS, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S BANKRUPTCY; . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT HAS RECEIVED A NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF BANKRUPTCY FROM THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT. THE COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR A SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SET FOR SEPTEMBER 6, 2001 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DIVISION 2.
  • 06/25/2001
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND VACATING THE DISCHARGE OF BANKRUPTCY IF PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. FILED.
  • 05/21/2001
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF CASE RE: BANKRUPTCY CODE, MEETING OF CREDITORS, AND FIXING OF DATES.
  • 04/17/2001
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO 08/13/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002 .
  • 04/17/2001
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .
  • 04/16/2001
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002 , HON. JOHN W. BUNNETT, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING X . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT. MATTER ORDERED OFF CALENDAR
  • 04/03/2001
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF CASE RE: BANKRUPTCY CODE, MEETING OF CREDITORS, AND FIXING OF DATES.
  • 03/27/2001
  • NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF CASE RE: BANKRUPTCY CODE, MEETING OF CREDITORS, AND FIXING OF DATES.
  • 03/20/2001
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (DEL ROSARIO,EDUARDO RAZO) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/16/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002 . COSTS OF $ 30.00 .
  • 03/12/2001
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # PAID . HEARING SET FOR 04/16/01 AT 09:00A M, IN DIV. 002
  • 03/12/2001
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.