This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2019 at 06:04:05 (UTC).

Choi v. Barr

Case Summary

On 04/01/2019 Choi filed an Other lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-9515

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YUJEONG CHOI

Aurora, CO 80017

Respondents

WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General

MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, United States Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Yujeong Choi

19780 East Idaho Avenue

Aurora, CO 80017

Respondent Attorneys

Lansing W. Tyler

Attorney at DHS Immigration and Customs Enforcement

12445 East Caley Avenue, Jim Bailey Building

Centennial, CO 80111

Oil Oil

Attorney at Department of Justice

450 5Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Sarah Pergolizzi

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20001

General Counsel

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20001

DOH/EOIR/BIA

Attorney at Attn: Certification Unit

P.O. Box 8530

Falls Church, VA 22041

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10648008] Order filed by Clerk of the Court response to motion to dismiss case due on 05/24/2019 for Yujeong Choi. Served on 05/10/2019. [19-9515] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:02 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

Petition for Review Letter

Open Restricted Document #1

Main Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10648008] Order filed by Clerk of the Court response to motion to dismiss case due on 05/24/2019 for Yujeong Choi. Served on 05/10/2019. [19-9515] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10647905] Motion filed by Respondent Mr. William P. Barr to dismiss case. Served on: 05/10/2019. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-9515] SP [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10641528] Agency jurisdictional review complete. Petitioner's brief due on 05/28/2019 for Yujeong Choi. [19-9515] [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10639436] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Sarah Pergolizzi for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/08/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-9515] [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • [10639427] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah K. Pergolizzi for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/08/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-9515]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/8/2019] SP [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10637470] Petitioner's motion filed by Yujeong Choi for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery. [19-9515] [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10637467] Petition for review filed. Original. Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail and hand. Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, General Counsel, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 04/01/2019 letter. Fee: IFP pending. Agency record due 05/13/2019 for William P. Barr. Notice of appearance due on 04/15/2019 for Yujeong Choi and William P. Barr [19-9515]--[Edited 04/01/2019 by LG to correct party] [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less