This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2020 at 06:16:36 (UTC).

Locke et al v. Caterpillar, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2009 Locke filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Caterpillar, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. Dorr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:09-CV-03060

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard E. Dorr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roy A. Locke

Laverna D. Locke

Defendant

Caterpillar, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William H. McDonald

4857 East Royal Dr.

Springfield, MO 65809

Defendant Attorney

Steven P. Sanders

Attorney at Williams, Venker, & Sanders, LLC

100 North Broadway, 21St Floor

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2009)

#22

(#22) RULES OF JURY TRIAL. (Schroeppel, Kerry) (Entered: 11/06/2009)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar, Inc. of Rsp to Plaintiff's Discovery filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 08/11/2009)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke Plaintiffs' First Request To Produce filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Plaintiffs Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke.(McDonald, William) (Entered: 07/02/2009)

#15

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2009)

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint, filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/2/2009 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (McDonald, William) (Entered: 03/18/2009)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)

#4

(#4) SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to dismiss case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of appearance by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint, filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/2/2009 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (McDonald, William) (Entered: 03/18/2009)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER, case dismissed with prejudice pursuant to stipulation. (Schroeppel, Kerry) (Entered: 12/08/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION of dismissal with Prejudice by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 11/09/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RULES OF JURY TRIAL. (Schroeppel, Kerry) (Entered: 11/06/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AMENDED SCHEDULING & JURY TRIAL ORDER: discovery ddl 2/26/2010, dispositive motions ddl 3/26/2010, pretrial teleconference 7/7/2010 03:00 PM, jury trial set for 7/19/2010 09:00 AM in District Courtroom 1, Springfield. (Schroeppel, Kerry) (Entered: 11/06/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2009
  • Docket(#20) LETTER OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge William A. Knox to District Judge Richard E. Dorr. This is a change in judge only. The case number should now read 09-3060-CV-S-RED. TEXT ENTRY ONLY - no document is attached. (Price, Jackie) (Entered: 11/04/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar, Inc. of Rsp to Plaintiff's Discovery filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 08/11/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Plaintiffs Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke.(McDonald, William) (Entered: 07/03/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke Plaintiffs' First Request To Produce filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Plaintiffs Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke.(McDonald, William) (Entered: 07/02/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke First Interrogatories To Defendant Caterpillar, Inc. filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Plaintiffs Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke.(McDonald, William) (Entered: 07/01/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc..(Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to amend/correct #1 Complaint, filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of Laverna D. Locke, Roy A. Locke. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/2/2009 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (McDonald, William) (Entered: 03/18/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 4/1/2009 (Price, Jackie) (Entered: 03/17/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • DocketSECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plts This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda) (Entered: 03/13/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION to dismiss case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to dismiss case Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/27/2009 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of appearance by Steven P. Sanders on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Sanders, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Caterpillar, Inc.. (Anderson, Christy) (Entered: 02/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by William H. McDonald on behalf of all plaintiffs. Filing fee $350, receipt number 08660000000002002670. Service due by 6/23/2009.(McDonald, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2009: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Christy). (Entered: 02/20/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to plaintiff's counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 3/16/2009 (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 02/19/2009)

    Read MoreRead Less