This case was last updated from PACER on 06/10/2019 at 06:08:19 (UTC).

Shure Incorporated v. ClearOne, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 Shure Incorporated filed an Other lawsuit against ClearOne, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1755

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

SHURE INCORPORATED

Appellee

CLEARONE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Thomas J. Campbell Jr.

Attorney at Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg, LLP

Two North Lasalle Street, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60602

Meredith Martin Addy

Attorney at AddyHart P.C.

10 Glenlake Parkway

Atlanta, GA 60604

Robert Patrick Hart

Attorney at AddyHart P.C.

401 North Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60611

Appellee Attorneys

Matthew Carmine Phillips

Attorney at Laurence & Phillips IP Law LLP

7327 Sw Barnes Road

Portland, OR 97225

Matthew C. Phillips

Attorney at Laurence & Phillips IP Law LLP

7327 Sw Barnes Road

Portland, OR 97225

Kevin Brent Laurence

Attorney at Laurence & Phillips IP Law

2220 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, 4Th Floor East

Washington, DC 20037-1701

Derek Meeker

Attorney at Laurence & Phillips IP Law LLP

7327 Sw Barnes Road

Portland, OR 97225

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. Appellant's brief is due 07/22/2019. [609351] [TAM] [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:59 PM]

#14

(#14) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602783] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:45 PM]

#13

(#13) Corrected Entry of appearance for Robert Hart as of counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602780] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:40 PM]

#12

(#12) Entry of appearance for Meredith M. Addy as principal counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602779] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:38 PM]

#11

(#11) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602778] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:35 PM]

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Shure Incorporated, Entry of Appearance for Meredith M. Addy. Robert Hart and Docketing Statement [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 05/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[602693] [TAM] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:35 PM]

#9

(#9) Entry of appearance for Matthew C. Phillips as principal counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602583] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:58 AM]

#8

(#8) Entry of appearance for Derek Meeker as of counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602580] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:56 AM]

#7

(#7) Entry of appearance for Kevin B. Laurence as of counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602578] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:54 AM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602575] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:52 AM]

#5

(#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602574] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:50 AM]

#4

(#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602398] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:10 PM]

#3

(#3) Entry of appearance for Robert Hart as of counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602397] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:07 PM]

#2

(#2) Entry of appearance for Meredith M. Addy as principal counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602396] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:03 PM]

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Certified list from the United States Patent and Trademark Office. Service: 05/21/2019 by email. Appellant's brief is due 07/22/2019. [609351] [TAM] [Entered: 05/23/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: re:attorney entry of appearance Docket No. [ # 13 ], ERROR: The contact information included on the Entry of Appearance for Robert Hart does not match the information in the attorney's user account. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FCR 47.3(c)(1), please update as needed to ensure the contact information on the Entry of Appearance and in the user account matches. Please update ECF account information at www.pacer.gov. [603164] [TAM] [Entered: 04/26/2019 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corrected Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602783] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corrected Entry of appearance for Robert Hart as of counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602780] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Entry of appearance for Meredith M. Addy as principal counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602779] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602778] [19-1755] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/24/2019 06:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submissions of Appellant Shure Incorporated, Entry of Appearance for Meredith M. Addy. Robert Hart and Docketing Statement [ # 2 ], [ # 3 ], [ # 4 ], are not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant documents due on 05/01/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[602693] [TAM] [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Entry of appearance for Matthew C. Phillips as principal counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602583] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Derek Meeker as of counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602580] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Kevin B. Laurence as of counsel for Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602578] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602575] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Interest for the Appellee ClearOne, Inc.. Service: 04/24/2019 by email. [602574] [19-1755] [Matthew Phillips] [Entered: 04/24/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602398] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Entry of appearance for Robert Hart as of counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602397] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Meredith M. Addy as principal counsel for Appellant Shure Incorporated. Service: 04/23/2019 by email. [602396] [19-1755] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 10 ] [Meredith Addy] [Entered: 04/23/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/08/2019. [599162] Entry of Appearance due 04/25/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/25/2019. Docketing Statement due 04/25/2019. Certified List due on 05/21/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 04/11/2019 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less