This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2015 23:45:21

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 08/12/2009 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by LUZ P MALUNDO against EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number BC419652
  • Filing Date 08/12/2009
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Contract - Debt Collection
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge RITA MILLER
  • Courthouse Stanley Mosk Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff MALUNDO LUZ P.
  • Represented By
    • MOSQUEDA ROMAN P.
  • Defendant DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant DOES 1 TO 50
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS

8/12/2009: SUMMONS

Fees Apply
SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT...

3/30/2010: SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COU...

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/19/2009: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/30/2010: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Fees Apply
REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

3/30/2010: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT

Fees Apply
PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF C...

3/30/2010: PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR...

Fees Apply
NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/2/2009: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Fees Apply
NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

12/30/2009: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Fees Apply
Minute Order

3/1/2010: Minute Order

Fees Apply
MINUTE ORDER

3/30/2010: MINUTE ORDER

Fees Apply
JUDGMENT

3/30/2010: JUDGMENT

Fees Apply
DECLARATION OF ROMAN P. MOSQUEDA IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR E...

3/30/2010: DECLARATION OF ROMAN P. MOSQUEDA IN SUPPORT OF RE...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2011
  • Abstract of Judgment (ISSUED; RETURNED VIA MAIL ) Filed by Attorney for Creditor
  • 10/21/2011
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
  • 03/30/2010
  • Declaration (DECLARATION OF ROMAN P. MOSQUEDA ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
  • 03/30/2010
  • Declaration (PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
  • 03/30/2010
  • Miscellaneous-Other (SUMMARY OF THE CASE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
  • 03/30/2010
  • Judgment Filed by Court
  • 03/30/2010
  • Request to Enter Judgment Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
  • 03/30/2010
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) (DOE DEFTS ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
  • 12/30/2009
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
  • 12/02/2009
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Clerk
  • 10/19/2009
  • Default Entered (AS EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
  • 08/12/2009
  • Complaint