This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:15:18 (UTC).

Adelfo Cerame, Jr. v. Pear Tree Village Apartments, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Adelfo Cerame, Jr filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Pear Tree Village Apartments, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02385

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Adelfo Cerame

Adelfo Cerame, Jr.

Defendants

Pear Tree Village Apartments, LLC

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross Cornell

Attorney at Law Offices of Ross Cornell APC

111 West Ocean Boulevard Suite 400

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, and Response to the Order to Show Cause Why the Court Should Not Decline to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction Over the Asserted State Claims, by 3/16/2020. (rrp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pear Tree Village Apartments, LLC. (car) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adelfo Cerame, (Cornell, Ross) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adelfo Cerame. (Cornell, Ross) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Adelfo Cerame. (Cornell, Ross) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24931265 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Adelfo Cerame. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Adelfo Cerame(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, and Response to the Order to Show Cause Why the Court Should Not Decline to Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction Over the Asserted State Claims, by 3/16/2020. (rrp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pear Tree Village Apartments, LLC. (car) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Adelfo Cerame. (Cornell, Ross) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adelfo Cerame, (Cornell, Ross) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adelfo Cerame. (Cornell, Ross) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24931265 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Adelfo Cerame. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Adelfo Cerame(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less