Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2019 at 07:25:35 (UTC).

BOYD v. COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 BOYD filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Renee Marie Bumb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-15452

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Renee Marie Bumb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIANCA BOYD

Defendant

COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER ALAN MACEY, JR.

Attorney at BELL & BELL LLP

1617 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1020

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorneys

CHRISTINE P. O'HEARN

Attorney at BROWN & CONNERY, LLP

360 Haddon Avenue, Po Box 539

Westmont, NJ 08108

JOSEPH G. ANTINORI

Attorney at BROWN & CONNERY, LLP

360 Haddon Avenue, Po Box 539

Westmont, NJ 08108

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIANCA BOYD. COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (MACEY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE P. O'HEARN on behalf of COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (O'HEARN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH G. ANTINORI on behalf of COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (ANTINORI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9820541) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BIANCA BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BIANCA BOYD. COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL waiver sent on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (MACEY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE P. O'HEARN on behalf of COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (O'HEARN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH G. ANTINORI on behalf of COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL (ANTINORI, JOSEPH) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against COOPER UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9820541) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BIANCA BOYD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MACEY, CHRISTOPHER) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less