This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2018 at 07:31:17 (UTC).

Harrington v. PepsiCo, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 Harrington filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against PepsiCo, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01301

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia L. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendell Harrington

Defendants

Pepsi Beverages Company

PepsiCo, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas B. Ponder

Attorney at PONDER ZIMMERMANN LLC

20 S. Sarah St.

St. Louis, MO 63108

Defendant Attorneys

Eugene P. Schmittgens, Jr.

Attorney at ROUSE AND FRETS, LLC

P.O. Box 7147

Chesterfield, MO 63006

Lisa A. Dreishmire

Attorney at MASUDA AND FUNAI, LTD.

203 N. Lasalle St., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Nancy Etsuko Sasamoto

Attorney at MASUDA AND FUNAI, LTD.

203 N. Lasalle St., Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PepsiCo, Inc..(Dreishmire, Lisa) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Nancy Etsuko Sasamoto for Defendant PepsiCo, Inc.. (Sasamoto, Nancy) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa A. Dreishmire for Defendant PepsiCo, Inc.. (Dreishmire, Lisa) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Notice of Removal

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant PepsiCo, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#5

(#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: City of St. Louis Circuit Court, filed by Wendell Harrington.(JWD) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENTAL Civil Cover Sheet and Filing Form by Defendant Pepsico, Inc.. (Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Pepsico, Inc.. Subsidiaries: New Bern Transport Corporation,. (Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant PEPSICO INC. (Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Circuit Court Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - Circuit Court Petition for Damages

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 1822-CC10705, with receipt number 0865-6686976, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by PEPSICO INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Circuit Court Summons)(Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PepsiCo, Inc..(Dreishmire, Lisa) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docket Text ORDER: as to PepsiCo, Inc. Re: #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by PepsiCo, Inc.; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. (PepsiCo, Inc. answer due 9/7/2018.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 8/13/18. (KJS) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Nancy Etsuko Sasamoto for Defendant PepsiCo, Inc.. (Sasamoto, Nancy) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa A. Dreishmire for Defendant PepsiCo, Inc.. (Dreishmire, Lisa) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • (#7) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant PepsiCo, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (JWD) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: City of St. Louis Circuit Court, filed by Wendell Harrington.(JWD) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUPPLEMENTAL Civil Cover Sheet and Filing Form by Defendant Pepsico, Inc.. (Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Pepsico, Inc.. Subsidiaries: New Bern Transport Corporation,. (Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant PEPSICO INC. (Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 1822-CC10705, with receipt number 0865-6686976, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by PEPSICO INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B - Circuit Court Summons)(Schmittgens, Eugene) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less