This case was last updated from PACER on 08/12/2019 at 07:24:20 (UTC).

Nekouee v. Serve All Hospitality LLC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Nekouee filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Serve All Hospitality LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jean C. Hamilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-01696

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jean C. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fred Nekouee

Defendant

Serve All Hospitality LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Joseph Vincze

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. VINCZE

P.O. Box 792

Andover, KS 67002

Defendant Attorney

James C. Morris

Attorney at GORDON AND REES, LLP

100 S. 4Th Street, Suite 550

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/16/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/27/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/22/2019. (JMP) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#5

(#5) Serve All Hospitality LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Serve All Hospitality LLC.(Morris, James) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by James C. Morris for Defendant Serve All Hospitality LLC. (Morris, James) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee Process Server: Eastern Missouri (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Serve All Hospitality LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7277190, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/16/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 8/27/2019 11:00 AM before District Judge Jean C. Hamilton.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 07/22/2019. (JMP) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Serve All Hospitality LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Serve All Hospitality LLC.(Morris, James) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by James C. Morris for Defendant Serve All Hospitality LLC. (Morris, James) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fred Nekouee. Serve All Hospitality LLC served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Robert Joseph Vincze. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee Process Server: Eastern Missouri (Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Serve All Hospitality LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7277190, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Vincze, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less