This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2020 at 09:01:53 (UTC).

Cohen v. State of New Hampshire

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Cohen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of New Hampshire. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00916

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Cohen

Defendant

NH Department of Safety

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer A. Eber

Attorney at Orr & Reno PA

Po Box 3550, 45 S Main St

Concord, NH 03302

Defendant Attorney

Christina M. Wilson

Attorney at NH Attorney General's Office

33 Capitol St

Concord, NH 03301-6397

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina M. Wilson on behalf of NH Department of Safety Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party NH Department of Safety(pty:dft).(Wilson, Christina) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NH Department of Safety by Michael Cohen. Served/Mailed on 9/9/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/12/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Eber, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

2 #1

Notice ECF

#2

(#2) Summons issued electronically as to NH Department of Safety. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

1 #7

Summons - Waiver

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E to Complaint - copy of Feb. 2018 returned envelope

1 #4

Exhibit D to Complaint - 2/26/18 Notice of Action

1 #3

Exhibit C to Complaint - 2/14/18 Notice of Action

1 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint - envelope indicating payment of 12/15/17 Citation

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint - 12/15/17 Citation

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2020167 filed by Michael Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint - 12/15/17 Citation, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint - envelope indicating payment of 12/15/17 Citation, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint - 2/14/18 Notice of Action, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint - 2/26/18 Notice of Action, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint - copy of Feb. 2018 returned envelope, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons - Waiver)(Eber, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina M. Wilson on behalf of NH Department of Safety Attorney Christina M. Wilson added to party NH Department of Safety(pty:dft).(Wilson, Christina) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NH Department of Safety by Michael Cohen. Served/Mailed on 9/9/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/12/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Eber, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued electronically as to NH Department of Safety. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-916-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2020167 filed by Michael Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint - 12/15/17 Citation, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint - envelope indicating payment of 12/15/17 Citation, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint - 2/14/18 Notice of Action, #4 Exhibit D to Complaint - 2/26/18 Notice of Action, #5 Exhibit E to Complaint - copy of Feb. 2018 returned envelope, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons - Waiver)(Eber, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less