This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2016 at 06:18:23 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES VS DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO

Case Summary

On 10/25/2007 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in California, Los Angeles. The Judges overseeing this case are LOOMIS, LLOYD and POGUE, NANCY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    BY871333

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Civil West Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LOOMIS, LLOYD

POGUE, NANCY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Defendant

DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO

Other

QUIAMBAO MARIA CARMEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES DEPT.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2013
  • Notice-Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • Order-Show Cause (and Affidavit for Contempt ) Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • Notice-Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2010
  • Order-After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2010
  • Order-After Hearing Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2010
  • Exhibit List (Joint )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2010
  • Statement-Facts (Joint )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2010
  • Witness List (Joint )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • Notice-Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2010
  • Supplement (Declaration of Maria Quiambao )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • Notice-Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2010
  • Declaration (of Maria Carmen )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2008
  • Notice-Entry of Judgt. & Cert Mail Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • Request-Enter Default Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • Judgment-Re: Parental Obligations Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • Declaration-Deflt/Uncont. Judgt. Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2008
  • Declaration-Amended Prop. Judgment Filed by Attorney for CSSD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2007
  • Complaint/Summons-Governmental

    Read MoreRead Less