This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 07:48:04 (UTC).

WRIGHT v. GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 WRIGHT filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan J. Dlott and Karen L. Litkovitz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00885

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan J. Dlott

Referral Judge

Karen L. Litkovitz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KYLE WRIGHT

Defendants

JOSHUA LANSDALE

GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC

John Doe 1-10

Jane Doe 1-10

John Doe

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth & Washington, LLC

6494 Centerville Business Parkway

Centerville, OH 45459

Christina M Spencer

Attorney at Hollingsworth & Washington, LLC

6494 Centerville Business Pkwy

Centerville, OH 45459

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas M. Oldham

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

41 S. High Street, Ste. 3300

Columbus, OH 43215

Michael P. Palmer

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

700 1St Source Bank Center, 100 North Michigan

South Bend, IN 46601

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Kyle Wright. (Spencer, Christina) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

11 #1

Supplement Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Partial Motion

#11

(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Partial Motion to Dismiss) (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hollingsworth for Plaintiff Kyle Wright (Hollingsworth, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

8 #2

Appendix Certificate of good standing

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7167086) of Michael P. Palmer by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Oldham, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #2 Appendix Certificate of good standing) (wam). (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale re #5 Complaint Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#5

(#5) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Kyle Wright. Filed in Warren County Court of Common Pleas on 9/17/2019 (jlw) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Service of State Court Filings on Defendants

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV092613 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7160570), filed by JOSHUA LANSDALE, GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of State Court Filings on Defendants, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Plaintiff Kyle Wright. (Spencer, Christina) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Partial Motion to Dismiss) (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Palmer. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 10/24/19. (wam) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hollingsworth for Plaintiff Kyle Wright (Hollingsworth, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7167086) of Michael P. Palmer by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Oldham, Douglas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #2 Appendix Certificate of good standing) (wam). (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Defendants General Engine Products, LLC, Joshua Lansdale re #5 Complaint Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER by Judge Susan J. Dlott REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (vp) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: General Engine Products, LLC answer due 11/15/2019; Joshua Lansdale answer due 11/15/2019. (jlw) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Kyle Wright. Filed in Warren County Court of Common Pleas on 9/17/2019 (jlw) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (jlw) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE OR PLEAD by Defendants GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC, JOSHUA LANSDALE. (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas M. Oldham for Defendants GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC, JOSHUA LANSDALE (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Warren County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV092613 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7160570), filed by JOSHUA LANSDALE, GENERAL ENGINE PRODUCTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Service of State Court Filings on Defendants, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Oldham, Douglas) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less