This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2016 10:46:24

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 03/15/2010 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, against REY-MONROY, MA MILDRED in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number 10Z00348
  • Filing Date 03/15/2010
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Property - Residential Eviction
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge LEONARD D. NASATIR
  • Courthouse Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Plaintiff BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP FKA COUNTRYWIDE HOME LAONS SERVICING LP.
  • Represented By
    • MILES, BAUER, BERGSTROM & WINTERS, LLP - RYAN W STOCKING ESQ
  • Defendant DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO ADDED PER 1174.25 B CCP
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant REY-MONROY MA MILDRED
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA10Z00348 TO LB 10Z00348
  • 08/12/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .
  • 07/26/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 164.04 PER DAY.
  • 07/26/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. LASD . RECEIPT # PAID .
  • 07/08/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP,) FKA (COUNTRYWIDE HOME LAONS SERVICING, LP.) FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION: YOUR REQUEST AS TO BOTH DEFENDANTS AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, HOWEVER, THE JUDGMENT IS AS TO EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO ONLY SUBMITTED ON 07/06/10
  • 07/06/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LAURA C. ELLISON PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING SPECIALLY BY CARL SHAFF II, ESQ. . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .
  • 07/06/2010
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.
  • 07/06/2010
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .
  • 07/06/2010
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/06/10 , FOR (BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP,) FKA (COUNTRYWIDE HOME LAONS SERVICING, LP.) , AGAINST (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) ADDED PER 1174.25 (B) CCP , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 1717 AXENTY WAY, REDONDO BEACH, CA 90278 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.
  • 07/06/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.
  • 06/24/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 001 RE: CALENDAR OF 07/06/10
  • 06/10/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP,) FKA (COUNTRYWIDE HOME LAONS SERVICING, LP.) FOR REJECTION OF MEMO TO SET FOR TRIAL: PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THE COURT HAS SET AND CONTINUED THE TRIAL TO JULY 6, 2010 IN DEPT 01 SUBMITTED ON 06/08/10
  • 06/09/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE ORDER RE: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL , P & A, AND DECLARATION RE: NOTICE FILED. MATTER SET FOR 06/09/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # WAIVER .
  • 06/09/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 001 RE: EX-PARTE HEARING
  • 06/09/2010
  • NOTICE EX-PARTE FILED.
  • 06/09/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LEONARD D. NASATIR, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL. . APPLICATION GRANTED. THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL IS CONTINUED TO JULY 6, 2010 AT 08:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 1. DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE.
  • 06/09/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 07/06/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 001 .
  • 06/09/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.