This case was last updated from PACER on 03/24/2019 at 06:01:07 (UTC).

Guillermo Reyes Garcia v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 Guillermo Reyes Garcia filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against William Barr, U S Atty Gen. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-60060

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUILLERMO REYES GARCIA

Respondents

MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL

WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marvic Gonzalez Thompson

2356 Drusilla Lane

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Respondent Attorney

Robert Dale Tennyson Ph. D. Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0878

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

CAR 1 OF 1

Open Restricted Document #1

Index

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #2

DKT-4 Letter (IMG)

Open Restricted Document #1

Petition for Review

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/03/2019 for Petitioner Guillermo Reyes Garcia. [19-60060] (DDL) [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: providing parties with revised caption to be used on all future filings [19-60060] (MAS) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60060] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/21/2019 07:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Dale Tennyson Jr. for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60060 [19-60060] (MAS) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8968155-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60060] (CB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60060] (Robert Dale Tennyson Jr.) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Guillermo Reyes Garcia. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/22/2019. Immigration File Number: a216 567 089 Administrative Record due on 03/04/2019 [19-60060] (CB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 07:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less