Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2020 at 04:35:53 (UTC).

New York State Public Service v. FERC

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 New York State Public Service filed an Other lawsuit against FERC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1220

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

New York State Public Service Commission

Respondent

Federal Energy Regulatory Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jeffrey Alan Schwarz

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

John J. Sipos

Attorney at New York State Department of Public Service

3 Empire State Plaza

Albany, NY 12223-1350

Amber L. Martin Stone

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Scott Harris Strauss

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

Peter J. Hopkins Esquire

Attorney at Spiegel & McDiarmid LLP

1875 Eye Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1848401] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 08/06/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 07/22/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 07/22/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 08/06/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 08/06/2020 [20-1220] [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:01 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED COPY [1848399] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1848396-2 ] [20-1220] [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:57 PM]

Open Document

PETITION FOR REVIEW [1848396] of a decision by federal agency filed by New York State Public Service Commission [Service Date: 06/18/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1220] [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:55 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1848401] filed directing party to file initial submissions: PETITIONER docketing statement due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER certificate as to parties due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER statement of issues due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER underlying decision due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER deferred appendix statement due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER procedural motions due 07/22/2020. PETITIONER dispositive motions due 08/06/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: RESPONDENT entry of appearance due 07/22/2020. RESPONDENT procedural motions due 07/22/2020. RESPONDENT certified index to record due 08/06/2020. RESPONDENT dispositive motions due 08/06/2020 [20-1220] [Entered: 06/22/2020 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY [1848399] of Petition for Review sent to respondent [ # 1848396-2 ] [20-1220] [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW [1848396] of a decision by federal agency filed by New York State Public Service Commission [Service Date: 06/18/2020 ] Disclosure Statement: Attached; Certificate of Parties: Not Applicable to this Filing. [20-1220] [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR REVIEW CASE docketed. [20-1220] [Entered: 06/22/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less