This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 09:24:41 (UTC).

Singey v. Boulder Valley School District et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 Singey filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Boulder Valley School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon P. Gallagher, Kristen L. Mix and Daniel D. Domenico. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03244

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

Presiding Judges

Gordon P. Gallagher

Daniel D. Domenico

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathryn Singey

Louisville, CO 80027

Defendants

Shely Langraf

Chavonne Gloster

Mike Cuskelly

Boulder Valley School District

Shelly Landgraf

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rajasimha Raghunath

Attorney at Raghunath Law Firm LLC

P.O. Box 372299

Denver, CO 80237

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Attachment 1

#16

(#16) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/20 GRANTING #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rajasimha Raghunath terminated as counsel of record. Plaintiff is now proceeding as pro se. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

14 #2

USMS Service Form

14 #1

USMS Service Form

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #9 Amended Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USMS Service Form, #2 USMS Service Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

13 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney from Limited Representation by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Raghunath, Rajasimha) (Entered: 01/04/2020)

#11

(#11) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a), the Court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. Case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03244-DDD. FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any Defendants for whom personal service is required. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/21/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boulder Valley School District, Mike Cuskelly, Chavonne Gloster, Shely Langraf, filed by Kathryn Singey.(Raghunath, Rajasimha) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance to Provide Limited Representation by Rajasimha Raghunath on behalf of Kathryn Singey. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #6 Leave to Provide Limited Scope Representation. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/04/2019.(rvill, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

6 #2

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

6 #1

Exhibit Proposed Entry of Appearance

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appoint Limited Representation Counsel by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Entry of Appearance, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Raghunath, Rajasimha) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER to File Amended Employment Discrimination Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiff file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint, on the court-approved Employment Discrimination Complaint form, that complies with this order. If Plaintiff fails within the time allowed to file an amended employment discrimination complaint, or demonstrate good cause for obtaining an extension of time, this action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/22/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/21/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(rsams, ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/20 GRANTING #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rajasimha Raghunath terminated as counsel of record. Plaintiff is now proceeding as pro se. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(nmarb, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney from Limited Representation filed by Kathryn Singey. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/6/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #9 Amended Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USMS Service Form, #2 USMS Service Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney from Limited Representation by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Raghunath, Rajasimha) (Entered: 01/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • (#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on December 23, 2019. Text Only Entry (dddlc2) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a), the Court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. Case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 19-cv-03244-DDD. FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any Defendants for whom personal service is required. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/21/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Boulder Valley School District, Mike Cuskelly, Chavonne Gloster, Shely Langraf, filed by Kathryn Singey.(Raghunath, Rajasimha) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance to Provide Limited Representation by Rajasimha Raghunath on behalf of Kathryn Singey. (rvill, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Granting #6 Leave to Provide Limited Scope Representation. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/04/2019.(rvill, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appoint Limited Representation Counsel by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Entry of Appearance, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Raghunath, Rajasimha) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER to File Amended Employment Discrimination Complaint. ORDERED that Plaintiff file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended complaint, on the court-approved Employment Discrimination Complaint form, that complies with this order. If Plaintiff fails within the time allowed to file an amended employment discrimination complaint, or demonstrate good cause for obtaining an extension of time, this action will be dismissed without further notice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/22/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/21/2019. (rvill, ) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(rsams, ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Employment Discrimination COMPLAINT against Boulder Valley School District, Mike Cuskelly, Chavonne Gloster, Shely Langraf, filed by Kathryn Singey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(rsams, ) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less