This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2019 07:38:40

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/10/2019 a Contract - Insurance case was filed by Johnson against Coe in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 2:19-cv-02428
  • Filing Date 06/10/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Other Disposed
  • Case Type Contract - Insurance
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Edmund A. Sargus
  • Courthouse Ohio Southern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Joan Mahar
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Jaimie Coe
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Nationwide Insurance
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Terry J. Griggs
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Victoria Fire and Casualty Company
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Dr. Richard Weiss
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Robert W Johnson
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented

Court Documents

#10

(#10) OPINION AND ORDER The Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's Obje...

Free with Subscription
#7

(#7) ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's Motion...

Free with Subscription
9 #1

Envelope

Fees Apply
#11

(#11) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/5/2019. ...

Fees Apply
#9

(#9) OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation and Recusal o...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) COMPLAINT against Jaimie Coe, Terry J. Griggs, Joan Mah...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that th...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge C...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • (#11) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/5/2019. (cmw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#10) OPINION AND ORDER The Court OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objection ECF No. #9 ; Adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations ECF No. #7 . This case is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is DEEMED A VEXATIOUS LITIGATOR. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/2/2019. (cmw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
  • 07/29/2019
  • (#9) OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendation and Recusal of Presiding Judge by Plaintiff Robert W Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#8) COMPLAINT against Jaimie Coe, Terry J. Griggs, Joan Mahar, Nationwide Insurance, Victoria Fire and Casualty Company, and Richard Weiss, filed by Robert W Johnson. (daf) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#7) ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis are GRANTED. It is RECOMMENDED that the Court DISMISS each of the above-captioned actions for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). It is further RECOMMENDED that the Court deem Plaintiff a vexatious litigator and enjoin him from filing any new actions without either (a) submitting a certification from an attorney who is licensed to practice in this Court or the State of Ohio, stating that there is a good faith basis for the claims Plaintiff seeks to assert; or (b) tendering a proposed complaint for review by this Court prior to the actual filing of the complaint in the Court's docketing system. Finally, it is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff be required to include the captions and case numbers of all of his prior actions should he file a complaint in this or any other court. ( Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/23/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
  • 07/10/2019
  • (#6) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-1130, 2:19-cv-2490 and 2:19-cv-2865 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge George C. Smith on 7/10/2019. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
  • 06/25/2019
  • (#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/25/2019. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#4) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:19-cv-1130 and 2:19-cv-2490 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge George C. Smith on 6/20/2019. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 06/12/2019
  • (#3) ORDER: Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson recused. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/12/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 06/12/2019)
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons Form, Marshal Forms, and Service Documents) by Plaintiff Robert W Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Envelope) (daf) (Entered: 06/11/2019)