This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2020 at 10:54:17 (UTC).

Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. v. 3M Company

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 Saint-Gobain Adfors S A S filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J. Davis and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-MC-00052

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael J. Davis

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.

Respondent

3M Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Tara C Norgard

Attorney at Carlson Caspers Vandenburgh Lindquist & Schuman PA

225 S 6Th St Ste 4200

Mpls, MN 55402

Joseph Alexander Lawrence

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Jack W Londen

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Respondent Attorneys

Douglas E. McCann

Attorney at Fish & Richardson - Doug McCann

222 Delaware Avenue, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Brianna Lee Chamberlin

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

3200 Rbc Plaza, 60 South Sixth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Deanna J Reichel

Attorney at Fish & Richardson PC

60 S 6Th St Ste 3200

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

27 #5

Exhibit(s) SLA-5

27 #4

Exhibit(s) SLA-4

27 #3

Exhibit(s) SLA-3

27 #2

Exhibit(s) SLA-2

27 #1

Exhibit(s) SLA-1

#27

(#27) DECLARATION of Sara Louise Ashby re #24 Response, by 3M Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) SLA-1, #2 Exhibit(s) SLA-2, #3 Exhibit(s) SLA-3, #4 Exhibit(s) SLA-4, #5 Exhibit(s) SLA-5)(Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#26

(#26) DECLARATION of Dwight D. Erickson re #24 Response, by 3M Company . (Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

24 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#24

(#24) RESPONSE re #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, Opposition to Petitioner's Application for Order to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

4 #14

Exhibit(s) N

4 #13

Exhibit(s) M

4 #12

Exhibit(s) L

4 #11

Exhibit(s) K

4 #10

Exhibit(s) J

4 #9

Exhibit(s) I

3 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#3

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #3 Memorandum, #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Lawrence, Joseph) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#2

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #3 Memorandum, #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Lawrence, Joseph) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DECLARATION of Sara Louise Ashby re #24 Response, by 3M Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) SLA-1, #2 Exhibit(s) SLA-2, #3 Exhibit(s) SLA-3, #4 Exhibit(s) SLA-4, #5 Exhibit(s) SLA-5)(Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DECLARATION of Dwight D. Erickson re #24 Response, by 3M Company . (Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of Deanna J. Reichel re #24 Response, by 3M Company . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE re #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, Opposition to Petitioner's Application for Order to Take Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1782 filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Reichel, Deanna) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) EXHIBIT 1 (Corrected Version) re #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, filed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Lawrence, Joseph) (Entered: 08/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #20 Joint Request to Modify the Briefing Schedule: 3M Company's Opposition is due August 21, 2020; Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.'s reply is due September 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/11/2020. (KAT) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Modifying Briefing Schedule #20 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Chamberlin, Brianna) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time filed by 3M Company. (Chamberlin, Brianna) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER on #17 Joint Stipulation Setting Briefing Schedule. Response due by 8/19/2020. Reply due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/21/2020.(KAT) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation. (Chamberlin, Brianna) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. re #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #3 Memorandum, #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, #4 Declaration, #5 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Lawrence, Joseph) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph Alexander Lawrence for Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jack W Londen for Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/8/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (Miscellaneous) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-mc-52 MJD/KMM. (KDS) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jack W. Londen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7851167 filed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Norgard, Tara) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Alexander Lawrence. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7851128 filed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Norgard, Tara) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Memorandum, #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, #4 Declaration,. (Norgard, Tara) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Alexander John Diebler Wilson re #3 Memorandum, #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N)(Norgard, Tara) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM re #1 Initiating Document in a Miscellaneous Case, filed by Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Norgard, Tara) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Petitioner Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S.. (Norgard, Tara) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application of Saint-Gobain Adfors S.A.S. For An Order to Take Discovery For Use In Foreign Proceedings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1782 (filing fee $ 47, receipt number AMNDC-7850845). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Norgard, Tara) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less